Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/07/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/16/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 03/28/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/28/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/02/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/05/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/17/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/07/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/09/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 06/23/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 07/13/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/15/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 09/26/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 11/03/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/03/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 11/07/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/23/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 02/06/2012
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 02/06/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 02/07/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/09/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/08/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/04/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/11/2012