Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/28/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/28/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/28/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/28/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 02/28/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/01/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/10/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/14/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/16/2011
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/17/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/28/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 03/30/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 04/04/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/12/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/12/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/04/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/04/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/04/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/10/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/06/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/06/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/07/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/08/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/13/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/16/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/20/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/20/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/21/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/23/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/27/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/29/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/30/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/07/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/12/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/14/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/18/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/27/2011
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 08/02/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 08/02/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/06/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/06/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/04/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 10/31/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 10/31/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 12/05/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/23/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 02/07/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/13/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/16/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 02/28/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/28/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/02/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/12/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/12/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/12/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/13/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/14/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 03/14/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/14/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 03/14/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/14/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/14/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/14/2012
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/14/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/14/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/14/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/14/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 03/14/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/19/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/19/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/19/2012
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/19/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/19/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/19/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/19/2012
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/21/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 03/22/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/22/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/26/2012
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 03/26/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/27/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/27/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 04/17/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/24/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 05/08/2012