There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Marshals Service 225th Anniversary Commemorative Coin Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint coins in commemoration of the 225th anniversary of the establishment of the Nation's first Federal law enforcement agency, the United States Marshals Service.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/02/2011Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
03/02/2011Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 03/02/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/17/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/30/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/30/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/06/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/06/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/06/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/12/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/12/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/13/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/13/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/02/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/02/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/02/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/04/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/04/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/04/2011
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/11/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/14/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/09/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/23/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 10/19/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 11/01/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/02/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 11/08/2011
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/08/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/09/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 11/09/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 11/09/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/15/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 12/12/2011
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 12/13/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 12/13/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 12/13/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 12/13/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 12/14/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/14/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/14/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/14/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 12/14/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 12/14/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 12/14/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 12/14/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 12/14/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 12/14/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 12/14/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/15/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 12/15/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 12/15/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 12/15/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/15/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 12/15/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 12/16/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 12/16/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 12/16/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 12/16/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 12/16/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/16/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 12/16/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 12/16/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 12/16/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 12/16/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 12/16/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 12/16/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 12/16/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 12/16/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 12/16/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/16/2011

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs03/02/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.431. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/02/2011)

United States Marshals Service 225th Anniversary Commemorative Coin Act - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury, in commemoration of the 225th anniversary of the establishment of the United States Marshals Service, to mint and issue $5 gold and $1 silver coins emblematic of the 225 years of exemplary and unparalleled achievements of the U.S. Marshals Service.

Requires all such coin sales to include a surcharge of: (1) $35 per $5 coin; and (2) $10 per $1 coin. Requires distribution of the first $5 million to the U.S. Marshals Service National Museum for the preservation, maintenance, and display of artifacts and documents of the U.S. Marshals Service. Requires distribution of one-third of the remainder each to the National Center for Missing and Exploited Children, the National Law Enforcement Officers Memorial Fund in support of the National Law Enforcement Museum and the National Law Enforcement Officers Memorial, and to the Federal Law Enforcement Officers Association Foundation.

Authorizes the Secretary to strike and sell bronze duplicates of the $5 gold coins.