Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 03/02/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/17/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/30/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/30/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/06/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/06/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/06/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/12/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/12/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/13/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/13/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/02/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/02/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/02/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/04/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/04/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/04/2011
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/11/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/14/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/09/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/23/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 10/19/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 11/01/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/02/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 11/08/2011
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/08/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/09/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 11/09/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 11/09/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/15/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 12/12/2011
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 12/13/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 12/13/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 12/13/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 12/13/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 12/14/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/14/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/14/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/14/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 12/14/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 12/14/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 12/14/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 12/14/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 12/14/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 12/14/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 12/14/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/15/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 12/15/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 12/15/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 12/15/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/15/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 12/15/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 12/16/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 12/16/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 12/16/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 12/16/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 12/16/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/16/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 12/16/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 12/16/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 12/16/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 12/16/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 12/16/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 12/16/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 12/16/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 12/16/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 12/16/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/16/2011