Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/02/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/03/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/03/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/03/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/03/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/03/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/28/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/02/2011
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/25/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/06/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/06/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/15/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/13/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/19/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/19/2012
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/23/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/26/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/11/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/26/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/27/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/12/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/11/2012