Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 03/02/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/16/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/16/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/29/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/05/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/06/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 06/09/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 12/12/2011