Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 03/03/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/03/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/16/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 03/31/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/04/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/12/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/14/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/05/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/10/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/16/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/17/2011