Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 03/03/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 03/03/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/03/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 03/03/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/08/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 03/08/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/09/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/17/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/28/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/31/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 03/31/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/05/2011