Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/18/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/14/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/28/2011
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/28/2011
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/13/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/13/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/27/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/28/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/29/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 08/01/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/06/2011