Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/03/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 03/03/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/05/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/14/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/02/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/09/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/11/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/13/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 11/16/2011