Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/03/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 03/03/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 03/03/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/03/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 03/10/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/10/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/17/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/28/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/28/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/28/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/07/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/02/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/04/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/09/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/18/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/28/2011