Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/03/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 03/03/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/03/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 03/03/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/03/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/08/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/15/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/28/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/07/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/12/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/14/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/09/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/10/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/12/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/18/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/28/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/07/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/13/2012