Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/17/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/17/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/04/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/06/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/12/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/03/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/18/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/23/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/25/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/13/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/13/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/07/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/01/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/16/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 02/27/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/01/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 04/23/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/26/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/09/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/21/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/21/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/18/2012