Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 03/07/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/09/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 03/10/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/10/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/14/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/28/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/12/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/09/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 05/17/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/16/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/07/2011