Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 03/07/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/07/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/25/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/15/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 11/16/2011