Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/17/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/15/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/19/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/03/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 10/31/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 11/01/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/28/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/14/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/21/2012