Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/17/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 03/17/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/30/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/30/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/11/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/09/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/14/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/07/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/12/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/03/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 10/06/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 10/17/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 10/18/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/24/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/21/2012