Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/10/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 03/10/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/13/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 05/02/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 05/09/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/23/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/16/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/20/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/22/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/28/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/29/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/12/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/15/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/18/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/14/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 12/01/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/05/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/08/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 12/14/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 01/23/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 01/23/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/10/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/10/2012