Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/09/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/09/2011
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/14/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/15/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/17/2011
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/06/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/02/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 11/07/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 01/24/2012