Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/08/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/12/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/14/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/27/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/26/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/04/2011