There is one summary for this bill. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/09/2011)

Lease Extension and Secure Energy Act of 2011- Directs the Secretary of the Interior to extend by one year the term of each oil and gas lease (covered lease) for the Gulf of Mexico outer Continental Shelf region that was: (1) not producing as of April 30, 2010; or (2) suspended from operations, permit processing, or consideration, in accordance with either a certain moratorium dated May 30, 2010, or the decision memorandum of the Secretary dated July 12, 2010.

States that this extension of covered leases is in addition to any suspension of operations or suspension of production granted by the Minerals Management Service or the Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation and Enforcement after May 1, 2010.