Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/14/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/08/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/04/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/20/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/21/2011