Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/09/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/16/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/16/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/16/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/16/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 03/17/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/29/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/04/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/02/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/02/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/09/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 05/24/2011
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/25/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/07/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/21/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/21/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/22/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/27/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/20/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/14/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/16/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/15/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/15/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/28/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/10/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/30/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew