Refine your search

8 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
12/19/2011 Became Public Law No: 112-69. (TXT | PDF)
12/19/2011 Signed by President.
12/09/2011 Presented to President.
12/07/2011 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 12/05/2011 H8129)
12/01/2011 Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-298.
11/02/2011 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7090; text as passed Senate: CR S7090)
08/30/2011 Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/02/2011 without amendment. With written report No. 112-59.
03/09/2011 Introduced in Senate