Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/28/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/28/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/13/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/09/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/19/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/13/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/06/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/18/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 10/03/2011