Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/10/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/12/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/11/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/11/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/11/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 07/25/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 11/02/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 11/02/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 12/12/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 02/16/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/20/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/29/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/22/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/05/2012