Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/14/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/14/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/16/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 03/16/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/30/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/04/2011