Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/15/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/30/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 05/18/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/23/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/27/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/09/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/09/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 02/29/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/20/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/21/2012