Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 03/10/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/06/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/08/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/05/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/06/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 10/03/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/06/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 10/17/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 10/17/2011