Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/14/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 03/14/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/15/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 04/08/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 05/18/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/06/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/10/2012