Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/14/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/28/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/30/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/30/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/05/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/02/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/10/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/18/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/18/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/18/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 01/23/2012