Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/05/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/14/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/14/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 04/14/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/14/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/09/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/09/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/09/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/09/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/11/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/25/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/20/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/12/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 10/20/2011