Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/15/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 03/15/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/15/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/29/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/12/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/03/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/10/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/28/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/11/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/06/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/06/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/29/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/07/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew