Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/15/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/15/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/15/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/15/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/15/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 03/15/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/15/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/03/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/10/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/11/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/14/2011