Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 03/16/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/29/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/29/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/29/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/31/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/31/2011
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/05/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/06/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/07/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 04/07/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/12/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/03/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/23/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 10/04/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/13/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 01/31/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew