Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/16/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 04/14/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/14/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/14/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/14/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 05/03/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/03/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/03/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/18/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/21/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/11/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 10/13/2011