Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/16/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/17/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/12/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/11/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/12/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/12/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/07/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/08/2011