Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/05/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/07/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/20/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/29/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 09/19/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/29/2012