Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/06/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/06/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/06/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/06/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 07/18/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/18/2011
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/25/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 07/25/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/25/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/25/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/25/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/25/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/25/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/25/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/25/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/25/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/25/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/25/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 07/25/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 07/25/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/25/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/25/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/25/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/26/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/26/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 12/12/2011