Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/28/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/01/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/01/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/18/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/08/2011