Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 03/28/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/28/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/29/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 07/18/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 08/02/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/06/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 09/12/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/19/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 09/20/2011