Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/28/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/30/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/13/2011
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/05/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 05/09/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/10/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/07/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/22/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/11/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 01/23/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/11/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/12/2012