Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 12/13/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 02/15/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/01/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 08/02/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/10/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 09/11/2012