Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/08/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/14/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/16/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/21/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/29/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/18/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/31/2011