Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 03/28/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/28/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/28/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 03/28/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/28/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/02/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 05/03/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/12/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 05/17/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/08/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/08/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/07/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/04/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/19/2012