Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/30/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/05/2011
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/06/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/02/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/11/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 06/28/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/17/2011