Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/29/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/31/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/31/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/04/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/04/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/05/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/05/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/05/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/07/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/07/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/12/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/23/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/07/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/09/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/09/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/09/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/14/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/20/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/20/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/29/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/29/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/05/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 07/05/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/14/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/19/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 08/02/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/21/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/21/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/03/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/10/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/17/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/30/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/01/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/16/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/24/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 01/24/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 02/07/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/22/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 04/17/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/16/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/18/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/18/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 08/02/2012