Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/30/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 03/30/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/22/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 10/17/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 10/17/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 11/01/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 12/01/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/07/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/31/2012