Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 03/30/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/31/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 05/02/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/20/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 12/14/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 03/19/2012