Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/31/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 09/15/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/17/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/26/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/27/2012